MS HB1445 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The General Fund Amount For Implied Consent Law Violation Assessments; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Implied Consent Law Violation Assessments; increase general fund of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseDied In Conference
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Bryan,Clarke,Hopson
2019-03-22HouseConferees Named Cockerham,Zuber,Burnett
2019-03-19HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-12SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-11SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-11SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-03-05SenateDR - TSDPAA: JB To AP
2019-02-27SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B;Appropriations
2019-02-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-13HousePassed
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback