MS HB1443 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 904, Local And Private Laws Of 1998, As Amended By Chapter 1023, Local And Private Laws Of 1999, As Amended By Chapter 901, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, To Authorize Board Members Of The Tallahatchie County Correctional Authority To Receive Per Diem, At The Discretion Of The Board Of Supervisors Of Tallahatchie County, Mississippi, For Attendance Of Meetings Of The Authority; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tallahatchie County Correctional Authority; authorize to receive per diem compensation for attending meetings of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2014-02-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed |
2014-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |