MS HB1439 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-7-38, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Repealer On The Provision That Authorizes Participation In Group Purchasing Programs By Certain Public Hospitals And Regional Mental Health Centers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Group purchasing programs by certain public hospitals and regional mental health centers; delete repealer on authority to participate in.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Passed |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2016-03-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | Passed |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |