MS HB1429 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-113-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "business Enterprise" To Reduce The Requirements Necessary For A Data Center To Be Included In Such Definition; To Revise The Definition Of The Term "state Tax" To Include Income Taxes And Franchise Taxes In The Taxes From Which A Data Center May Be Exempted; To Amend Section 57-113-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Business Enterprises Shall Be Exempt From State Taxes For A Period Of Ten Years After Certification From The Mississippi Development Authority Designating The Business Enterprise As Eligible For The Tax Exemptions; To Amend Section 27-65-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt From Sales Taxation The Sale Of Certain Utilities To Data Centers That Fall Within The Definition Of The Term "business Enterprise"; To Amend Sections 27-7-21, 27-13-5 And 27-13-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tax exemptions; revise the requirements that a data center must meet to be eligible for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed |
2019-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |