MS HB1422 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Regulatory Reduction Pilot Program; To Provide That The Pilot Agencies Shall Be The Mississippi Department Of Health, The Mississippi Department Of Transportation, The Mississippi Department Of Agriculture And Commerce And The Mississippi Department Of Information Technology Services; To Require Every Pilot Agency To Review And Report On Its Regulations, Rules And Guidance Documents; To Require Every Pilot Agency To Reduce Its Number Of Regulatory Requirements By Thirty Percent By December 31, 2022; To Provide That No Pilot Agency May Adopt A New Rule Unless It Removes Two Or More Existing Rules; To Require Peer To Conduct A Review Of The Pilot Agencies; To Amend Sections 5-3-57, 25-53-5, 41-3-15, 65-1-8 And 69-1-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Regulatory Reduction Pilot Program; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 74 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |