MS HB1421 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That The State Department Of Health Shall Establish A Grant Program To Be Known As The Arpa Rural Water Associations Infrastructure Grant Program To Assist Rural Water Associations In The Construction Of Eligible Drinking Water Infrastructure Projects Under The American Rescue Plan Act (arpa); To Provide That The Program Shall Be Funded From Appropriations From The Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Fund; To Provide That Upon The Approval Of An Application For A Grant Under The Program, The Department Shall Enter Into A Project Grant Agreement With Each Grantee To Establish The Terms Of The Grant For The Project, Including The Amount Of The Grant; To Provide That Any Personal Or Professional Services Contracts Entered Into By The Department In Carrying Out Its Responsibilities Under The Grant Program Shall Be Exempt From Review And Approval By The Public Procurement Review Board; To Amend Section 27-104-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provision; And For Related Purposes.
Title
ARPA Rural Water Associations Infrastructure Grant Programs; establish under Department of Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Otis Anthony [D] | Rep. Stephanie Foster [D] | Rep. John Faulkner [D] |
Rep. De Stamps [D] | Rep. Thomas Reynolds [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-31 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Polk,Michel |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,White |
2022-03-08 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Appropriations |