MS HB1415 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-33-157, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Rehabilitation Services To Borrow Money From The Mississippi Development Bank Or Other Financial Institutions For The Purpose Of Construction, Repair And Renovation Or Furnishing And Equipping Facilities Owned Or Under The Supervision Of The Department; To Provide That Prior To Entering Into Any Loan The Department Shall Certify The Available Revenue That The Department Intends To Utilize To Repay The Loan And That The Department Does Not Intend To Request An Additional Appropriation From State Source Funding To Pay Debt Service On Any Such Loan; To Amend Section 31-25-28, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Rehabilitation Services To Borrow Money From The Mississippi Development Bank In An Amount Not To Exceed $7,000,000.00 For The Purpose Of Construction At, And Repair And Renovation, Furnishing And Equipping Of, The Department's Office Building Located In Madison, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Rehabilitation Services; may borrow from financial institutions for capital improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-02-23 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-22 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-21 | Passed | |
2011-02-15 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-07 | Referred To Finance | |
2011-02-03 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-02 | Passed | |
2011-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-24 | Referred To Ways and Means |