MS HB1390 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-27 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-27 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-13-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Under What Circumstances And How A Person Acquitted By Reason Of Insanity And Committed To Mental Treatment May Be Released From Confinement; To Create Section 41-21-88, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Director Of A Treatment Facility To Which A Patient Has Been Committed Subsequent To Being Found Not Guilty Of A Criminal Charge By Reason Of Insanity To Notify The Sheriff Of The County Of Destination And The Victim Before Release; To Amend Section 41-21-87, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Acquittal by reason of insanity; revise release from treatment.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Gipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-27 | Died On Calendar | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Blackmon,Cockerham,Gipson | |
2010-03-15 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-08 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A | |
2010-02-08 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-02-04 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Judiciary A |