MS HB1389 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-7-58.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Owner Of Any Enclosure Containing And Preventing The Free Egress Of White-tailed Deer To Make Application To, And Receive A Permit From, The Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks; And For Related Purposes.
Title
White-tailed deer; require owner of enclosure preventing the free egress of to make application to and receive permit from the Dept. of Wildlife.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. Ken Morgan [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
2018-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |