MS HB1386 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Advocate Confidentiality Law; To Provide That Communications Of Victims Of Domestic Violence, Sexual Assault, Stalking And Human Trafficking With Advocates Are Confidential; To Establish Procedures For Disclosure In Limited Circumstances; To Provide For In-camera Review Before Disclosure; To Amend Section 93-21-109, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Advocate Confidentiality Law; establish procedures for disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-17 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |