MS HB1381 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide For The Licensure And Regulation Of Businesses That Use A Digital Network To Connect Riders To Drivers Who Provide Prearranged Rides; To Require That Such A Business Must Obtain A License From The Department Of Insurance In Order To Operate In This State; To Provide The Fee For Such License; To Require Certain Disclosures With Regard To Fares; To Provide That The Application Or Website Of Such Business Shall Display A Picture Of The Driver And The License Plate Number Of The Motor Vehicle Utilized To Provide The Prearranged Ride; To Require An Electronic Receipt To Be Transmitted To The Rider; To Require Certain Primary Automobile Insurance To Be Maintained By The Driver Or By The Business On Behalf Of The Driver; To Provide That Drivers Shall Be Independent Contractors And Not Employees Of The Business If Certain Conditions Are Met; To Require The Business To Implement A Zero-tolerance Policy Regarding A Driver's Activities While Accessing The Digital Platform Of Such Business; To Provide That Certain Requirements Must Be Met By Drivers Before They May Accept Trip Requests Through The Digital Platform Of The Business; To Require Such Business To Maintain Certain Records; To Authorize The Commissioner Of Insurance To Make Examinations Into The Affairs Of Such Businesses; To Restrict The Regulation Of Such Businesses By Local Governments; To Authorize The Commissioner Of Insurance To Adopt Rules And Regulations Necessary To Ensure Compliance With This Act; To Amend Sections 63-15-43 And 77-7-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Network Companies; establish regulations related to.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-04 Approved by Governor
2016-03-31HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-03-31SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-03-28SenateReturned For Enrolling
2016-03-24SenatePassed
2016-03-22SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2016-03-22SenateDR - TSDP: HI To AC
2016-03-11SenateReferred To Highways and Transportation;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2016-03-03HouseTransmitted To Senate
2016-03-03HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2016-03-01HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Haney, Busby, Massengill)
2016-03-01HousePassed
2016-03-01HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2016-02-25HouseRead the Third Time
2016-02-17HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2016-02-08HouseReferred To Transportation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback