MS HB136 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Require Any Public Officer Or Employee Handling Or Having The Custody Of Public Funds, By Virtue Of His Or Her Office Or Employment, To Give Bond In A Certain Amount; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual bond; require for public officers and employees handling or having the custody of public funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Finance
2021-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-04HousePassed
2021-01-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-08HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback