MS HB1359 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Employers To Seek Civil Remedies To Prevent Unlawful Conduct In The Workplace; To Define Certain Terms; To Provide Penalties For Violating Orders Issued Under This Act; To Provide That The Provisions Of This Act Shall Not Restrict The Right To Seek Other Available Civil Or Criminal Remedies; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Workplace violence; enact certain provisions to prevent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-03-02 | DR - TSDP: LA To JA | |
2010-02-19 | Referred To Labor;Judiciary, Division A | |
2010-02-17 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-11 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Read the Third Time | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-02 | DR - TSDPAA: JB To LA | |
2010-01-28 | DR - TSDPAA: LA To JB | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Labor;Judiciary B |