MS HB1349 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The "mississippi School District Emergency Bridge Loan Act" For The Purpose Of Assisting School Districts That Suffer Revenue Losses As A Result Of An Economic Downturn That Substantially Impacts The State And Local Revenues Available To School Districts; To Provide That The Program Shall Be Administered By The State Department Of Education; To Create The Mississippi School District Emergency Bridge Loan Fund; To Establish The Maximum Amount Of Any Loan From The Fund; To Provide That A School District That Receives A Loan From The Fund Shall Pledge For Repayment Of The Loan Any Part Of The Homestead Exemption Annual Tax Loss Reimbursement To Which It May Be Entitled; To Grant To The State Department Of Education Certain Powers And Duties With Regard To This Act; To Authorize The State Bond Commission To Declare The Necessity For General Funds To Fund The Loans Under This Program; To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Make Transfers From The General Fund To The Loan Fund For The Purpose Of Funding The Loans Under This Program; To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Issue Warrants To Make Loans Under This Program; To Provide For The Disposition Of Any Unneeded State Funds In The Loan Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS School District Emergency Bridge Loan Act; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-17 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-19 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-19 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-17 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-08 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-08 | Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Education | |
2010-02-17 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-11 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Read the Third Time | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-02 | DR - TSDP: WM To ED | |
2010-01-29 | DR - TSDP: ED To WM | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Education;Ways and Means |