MS HB1345 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 936, Local And Private Laws Of 2010, As Amended By Chapter 959, Local And Private Laws Of 2012, To Provide That Before Any Rule, Regulation Or Fee Is Imposed By The Harrison County Motor Vehicle For Hire Commission, The Commission Shall Receive Approval Of The Harrison County Board Of Supervisors For Such Rule, Regulation Or Fee; To Revise The Definition Of "motor Vehicle For Hire" As Used In This Act; To Provide That The Budget Of The Commission Shall Be Voted On And Approved By The Supervisors; To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors To Abolish The Commission If Certain Notice Is Given; To Extend The Date Of Repeal From January 31, 2013, To July 1, 2014; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Harrison County Motor Vehicle for Hire Commission; revise authority of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-02-11 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |
2013-01-30 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-01-29 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-01-29 | House | Passed |
2013-01-29 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |