MS HB1344 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 67-1-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Revenue To Promulgate Rules And Regulations Under The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law To Authorize Holders Of On-premises Retailer's Permits And Holders Of Package Retailer's Permits To Purchase Alcoholic Beverages From Manufacturers And Distributors Of Alcoholic Beverages And To Have Such Purchases Shipped Directly To A Permit Holder's Permitted Location; To Bring Forward Sections 67-1-43, 67-1-45, 67-1-51, 67-1-53, 67-1-55, 67-1-57, 67-1-73 And 67-1-79, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Are Sections Of The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Sections 27-71-5, 27-71-7, 27-71-15 And 27-71-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For The Levy Of Privilege Taxes On Holders Of Permits Issued Under The Local Option Alcoholic Beverage Control Law, Excise Taxes On Sales Of Alcohol Under Such Law And Restrictions On The Transportation Of Alcoholic Beverages Through Counties That Have Not Authorized The Sale Of Alcoholic Beverages, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Sections 97-31-47 And 93-31-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provide For Crimes Related To The Unlawful Transportation And Solicitation Of Orders Of Liquor, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; authorize DOR to promulgate rules allowing certain permit holders to purchase from manufacturers and distributors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 97 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Tourism |
2018-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed |
2018-01-31 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |