MS HB1338 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 81-5-85, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Provisions Regarding The Bank Merger Process To Make Them Consistent With The Mississippi Business Corporation Act; To Amend Section 81-5-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Mississippi Chartered Or Domiciled Banks Offering Open-end Credit To Assess Finance Charges And Other Charges At Rates Not More Than The Rates Imposed By Out-of-state Banks On Mississippi Customers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Business Corporation Act; revise bank merger process to be consistent with and revise provisions regarding banks in Mississippi that offer open-end credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Zuber [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
2018-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |