MS HB1337 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-21-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Status Of Forensic Interviews Conducted By A Child Advocacy Center; To Amend Section 43-21-261, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Disclosure Of Youth Court Records To A Guardian Ad Litem Duly Appointed By The Court, To Expand Disclosure For Trial Purposes, To Authorize The Department Of Child Protection Services To Share Certain Records And To Provide For Waiver Of Confidentiality In Certain Child Deaths Or Critical Injuries Of Children; To Amend Section 43-21-353, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Reporting Of Certain Fraudulent Allegations Of Abuse Or Neglect; To Amend Section 43-21-121, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Appointment Of Guardians Ad Litem By The Youth Court; To Amend Section 43-21-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Grounds For Custody Based On Parental Use Of Controlled Substances And To Require That All Oral Orders Be Reduced To Writing; To Amend Section 43-21-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require That All Hearings On The Record And Oral Orders Be Reduced To Writing; To Amend Section 43-21-613, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand The Circumstances Under Which A Review Hearing Is Required; To Amend Section 43-21-155, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Transfer Of Cases; To Amend Section 43-21-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Taking Of Custody Without A Warrant; To Amend Section 41-111-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Provisions Concerning The Investigatory And Reporting Duties Of The Child Death Review Panel To Include Child Near Fatalities; To Create New Code Section 41-111-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Mandate Reporting Of Child Fatalities And Near Fatalities So That Timely Investigations May Be Conducted In Appropriate Cases In Order To Decrease The Incidence Of Child Abuse And Neglect Causing Fatal Or Serious Injuries To Children, And To Promote The Safety And Welfare Of The Children Of This State; To Amend Section 43-21-257, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Central State Registry On Neglect And Abuse Cases; To Amend Section 93-17-55, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions In The Adoption Supplemental Benefits Law; To Amend Section 93-17-67, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Continuation Of Medicaid Benefits Post-adoption Under Certain Circumstances; To Amend Section 93-17-69, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify State Support For Nonrecurring Adoption Expenses; To Amend Section 93-31-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Circumstances Under Which Both Parents Must Execute A Temporary Power Of Attorney To Be Effective Under The Act; To Amend Section 93-31-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require That A Reason For The Execution Of The Power Of Attorney Be Stated; To Require An Affidavit Of Statutory Compliance By The Facilitating Agency; To Conform The Acknowledgement Clause And To Create A Statutorily Sufficient Form For Revocation Of A Power Of Attorney Granted Under The Act; To Require An Affidavit From A Custodial Parent Who Alleges Unavailability Of The Noncustodial Parent; To Amend Section 43-21-321, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Provisions Relating To Educational Services Provided To Students In Juvenile Detention Centers; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth Court Act; implement recommendations of supreme court commission on children's justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2019-02-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-13HousePassed
2019-02-13HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback