MS HB1328 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Small Business And Grocer Investment Act; To Provide That, To The Extent Funds Are Available, The Mississippi Development Authority, In Cooperation With Public And Private Sector Partners, Shall Establish A Program That Provides Grants And Loans And/or Promotes Access To Healthy Food Retailers That Increase Access To Fresh Fruits And Vegetables And Other Affordable Healthy Food In Underserved Communities; To Provide That The Mississippi Development Authority May Contract With One Or More Qualified Nonprofit Organizations Or Community Development Financial Institutions To Administer The Program Described In This Act Through A Public-private Partnership, To Raise Matching Funds, Market The Program Statewide, Evaluate Applicants, Make Award Decisions, Underwrite Loans, And Monitor Compliance And Impact; To Provide That The Program Shall Provide Funding On A Competitive, One-time Basis As Appropriate For The Eligible Project; To Provide The Types Of Programs And Projects For Which Funding May Be Provided; To Provide The Criteria That Must Be Met For Funding Under The Program; To Provide That The Mississippi Development Authority Shall Establish Program Benchmarks And Reporting Processes To Make Certain That The Program Benefits Both Rural And Urban Communities In Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Small Business & Grocer Investment Act; create to encourage consumption of affordable healthy foods in underserved communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Collins,Fillingane,Simmons (13th) |
2014-03-20 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Barker,Hood |
2014-03-18 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2014-02-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-13 | House | Passed |
2014-02-12 | House | Read the Third Time |
2014-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |