MS HB1322 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create New Section 67-3-48, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Small Craft Breweries Located In Mississippi That Produce Not More Than 60,000 Barrels Of Light Wine Or Beer Annually To Sell On The Premises Of The Brewery Light Wine Or Beer Produced At Such Brewery For Consumption On Or Off The Premises Of The Brewery; To Create New Section 67-3-48.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Small Craft Brewery That Is Acquired By An Entity That Manufactures Light Wine Or Beer That Does Not Fall Within The Definition Of The Term "small Craft Brewery" To Continue To Operate As A Small Craft Brewery Under Certain Circumstances; To Authorize A Small Craft Brewery That Acquires An Entity That Manufactures Light Wine Or Beer That Does Not Fall Within The Definition Of The Term "small Craft Brewery" To Continue To Operate As A Small Craft Brewery Under Certain Circumstances; To Amend Section 67-3-22, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Beer Production Limits That Apply To Brewpubs And To Authorize Brewpubs To Sell Light Wine Or Beer Produced At The Brewpub For Consumption Off The Premises Of The Brewpub In Certain Containers; To Amend Sections 67-3-3, 67-3-53, 67-3-55 And 67-3-69, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Amend Sections 27-71-301, 27-71-307, 27-71-311 And 27-71-331, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Impose An Excise Or Privilege Tax On Light Wine Or Beer Provided By Small Craft Breweries For Retail Sale By Such Breweries And Upon Beer Provided For Tasting Or Sampling; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Light wine or beer; authorize small craft breweries to sell light wine or beer they produce on the premises of the brewery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 89 N: 21 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-15 Approved by Governor
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-10HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-07HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2017-03-03SenateReturned For Concurrence
2017-03-02SenatePassed As Amended
2017-03-02SenateAmended
2017-02-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2017-02-22SenateReferred To Finance
2017-02-03HouseTransmitted To Senate
2017-02-01HousePassed
2017-02-01HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2017-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2017-01-16HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback