MS HB132 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-1-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exclude Church-owned Vehicles, Which Are Designed To Transport 30 Passengers Or Less, From The Definition Of Commercial Motor Vehicle For The Purposes Of Commercial Driver's Licenses; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Commercial driver's license; exempt church-owned vehicles from definition of commercial motor vehicle for purposes of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 104 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2015-02-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-05 | House | Amended |
2015-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-06 | House | Referred To Transportation |