MS HB1314 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-09 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 37-13-81, 37-13-85, 37-13-87 And 37-13-89, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Transfer The Responsibility For Employing And Establishing The Duties Of School Attendance Officers From The State Department Of Education To Local School Districts; To Require The Department To Transfer All Funds Appropriated For School Attendance Officers To Local School Districts By July 15 Of Each Year; To Require School Attendance Officers To Maintain Regular Office Hours, Beginning With The Date Of Their Return From Designated Leave Until The Last Day Prior To The Attendance Officer's Designated Leave Is Scheduled To Begin; To Amend Section 37-13-91, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Bring Forward Sections 37-13-83 And 37-9-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendments; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School attendance officers; transfer employment responsibilities from the State Department of Education to local school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Tabled |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 13 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 13 | 83 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 13 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 13 | 87 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 13 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 13 | 91 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 9 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2022/pdf/history/HB/HB1314.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/HB/1300-1399/HB1314IN.htm |