MS HB1311 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-29-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Further Clarify That Butalbital, A Schedule Iii Substance, Is A Schedule Iii Controlled Substance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Butalbital; clarify is a Schedule III controlled substance.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Drug Policy;Judiciary, Division B | |
2012-03-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Judiciary B |