MS HB1310 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize An Attorney To Issue A Subpoena If That Attorney Is Authorized To Practice Law In The Issuing Court; To Require That An Attorney Enter An Appearance In The Cause Of Action Before He Or She Issues A Subpoena In The Action; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Subpoenas; authorize attorneys who have entered an appearance to issue.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 101 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2022-01-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-01-27 | House | Passed |
2022-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |