MS HB1305 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 99-19-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Protect The Identities Of All Individuals And Entities Who Comprise The Execution Including, But Not Limited To, Any Supplier Of Lethal Injection Drugs; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Execution team; create and provide exemptions for drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 81 N: 35 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-03SenateDied In Committee
2015-02-17SenateReferred To Corrections;Judiciary, Division A
2015-02-13HouseTransmitted To Senate
2015-02-12HousePassed
2015-02-12HouseAmendment Failed
2015-02-11HouseRead the Third Time
2015-01-29HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2015-01-19HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback