MS HB1302 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 73-19-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Practice Of Optometry; To Provide For The Diseases And Conditions That Optometrists Are Authorized To Examine, Diagnose And Manage; To Provide That An Optometrist May Utilize Local Anesthesia In The Performance Of Certain Procedures; To Provide That No Optometrist Shall Perform Cataract Surgery Nor Any Other Intraocular Surgery Not Specifically Allowed In This Statute; To Provide That An Optometrist May Perform Yag Laser Posterior Capsulotomies If He/she Has Been Certified By The Board Of Optometry To Perform Optometric Yag Laser Posterior Capsulotomy Procedures; To Amend Section 73-19-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Provision That Allows Optometrists To Use Pharmaceutical Agents In Their Practice; To Amend Section 73-19-157, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Optometrists The Authority To Use And Prescribe Certain Pharmaceutical Medications; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optometry; Board shall define practice of, and authorize to perform certain procedures and use and prescribe certain drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 113 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17 Approved by Governor
2021-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-11SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-09HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2021-03-01SenateReturned For Concurrence
2021-02-25SenatePassed As Amended
2021-02-25SenateAmended
2021-02-23SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare
2021-02-04HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-03HousePassed
2021-02-03HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73191Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7319157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
731927Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback