MS HB130 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide That A Court Shall Conduct A Preliminary Hearing When A Child Is Alleged To Have Been Conceived As A Result Of A Rape Or Sexual Battery; To Require The Hearing Upon Conviction Of The Alleged Parent Of The Child; To Require A Court To Determine Whether There Is A Reasonable Chance That A Child Could Have Been Conceived From The Rape Or Sexual Battery; To Require The Court To Send All Information Related To The Conviction And The Preliminary Hearing To The Chancery Court Of The County In Which The Conviction Occurred; To Require The Chancery Court To Determine By Genetic Testing That A Child Was Conceived As A Result Of The Rape Or Sexual Battery For Which The Person Was Convicted; To Provide That The Court Shall Terminate The Parental Rights Of The Convicted Parent If The Child Is Proven To Have Been Conceived As A Result Of The Rape Or Sexual Battery; To Amend Sections 97-3-65, 97-3-101, 93-15-105, 93-15-107, 93-15-113, 93-15-115, 93-15-117 And 93-15-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity With The Preceding Provisions; To Bring Forward Section 11-7-3 And 91-1-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental Rights of Rapists; terminate for children conceived of rape.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-27SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2019-02-13HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-12HousePassed
2019-02-01HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-11HouseReferred To Judiciary B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback