MS HB130 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 21-3-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The City Or Town Clerk As An Elective Officer In Municipalities Operating Under A Code Charter And To Provide That Such Officer Shall Be Appointed By The Governing Authorities Of The Municipalities; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipal clerks in code charter municipalities; require to be appointed instead of elected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 99 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 99 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-17 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-17 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Conferees Named Doty,Fillingane,Polk |
2016-04-13 | House | Conferees Named Rushing,Denny,Holloway |
2016-04-05 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Amended |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Passed |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
2016-03-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Municipalities |