MS HB130 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 928, Local And Private Laws Of 2004, As Amended By Chapter 934, Local And Private Laws Of 2007, To Increase The Number Of Years And To Revise The Amount That The Board Of Supervisors Of Tunica County, Mississippi, Is Authorized To Contribute Funds To The Tunica County Economic Development Foundation, Inc.; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tunica County; revise number of years and amount authorized to contribute to Tunica County Economic Development Foundation, Inc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-04-02 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2012-03-28 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-26 | Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-07 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |