MS HB1298 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-41-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Seizure Of Animals And Equipment Utilized In Illegal Dog Fighting; To Amend Section 97-41-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Temporary Custody Of Mistreated Animals After Seizure, Posting Of Security To Cover Care, Require Court Review Every Thirty Days, And Require Excess Funds To Be Returned To The Owner; To Authorize Immediate Euthanasia Of An Animal Under Appropriate Circumstances; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Illegal dog fighting; revise seizure and forfeiture of animals.
Sponsors
Rep. Toby Barker [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Agriculture;Judiciary, Division A |
2016-03-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Passed |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |