MS HB1281 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 57-39-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Energy Efficiency Standards For Commercial Buildings; To Provide That The Mississippi Development Authority Shall Not Have Enforcement Authority Over This Section Of Law; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy efficiency standards; revise for commercial buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23 Approved by Governor
2013-04-09HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2013-04-09SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2013-04-02HouseConference Report Adopted
2013-04-02SenateConference Report Adopted
2013-04-01HouseConference Report Filed
2013-04-01SenateConference Report Filed
2013-03-29SenateConferees Named Burton,Ward,Sojourner
2013-03-25HouseConferees Named Cockerham,Ellis,Busby
2013-03-14HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2013-03-08SenateReturned For Concurrence
2013-03-07SenatePassed As Amended
2013-03-07SenateAmended
2013-02-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2013-02-13SenateReferred To Energy
2013-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2013-02-07HousePassed As Amended
2013-02-07HouseAmended
2013-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2013-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2013-01-21HouseReferred To Energy

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback