MS HB128 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-19-81 And 63-5-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Provisions Of Law That Authorize The Mississippi Department Of Transportation To Issue Harvest Permits To Owners And Operators Of Vehicles Hauling Certain Products; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Harvest permits; extend repealers on authority of MDOT to issue and provisions establishing maximum weight of such vehicles.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Formby [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2013-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-07 | House | Passed |
2013-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-30 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To TR |
2013-01-29 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To WM |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred To Transportation;Ways and Means |