MS HB127 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-61-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Requirement To Deposit Into The Working Cash-stabilization Reserve Fund A Certain Sum From The Money Remaining In The Education Enhancement Fund After Funds Are Distributed For Educational Purposes; To Amend Section 41-113-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Funds Appropriated From The Tobacco Control Program Fund That Are Unexpended At The End Of The Fiscal Year Shall Lapse Into The Health Care Expendable Fund; To Provide For Certain Transfers To The Capital Expense Fund During Fiscal Year 2020; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget process; provide for certain transfers into CEF and delete transfer of EEF funds into rainy day fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Approved by Governor
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-30SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-30HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-29HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-19SenateConferees Named Hopson,Wiggins,Blackwell
2020-06-18HouseConferees Named Read,Cockerham,White
2020-06-17HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-12SenateReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-11SenatePassed As Amended
2020-06-11SenateAmended
2020-06-04SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-05-11SenateReferred To Appropriations
2020-03-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-04HousePassed
2020-02-20HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-01-24HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback