MS HB1269 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-15-46, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Establish Licensing And Fees For Vessels Engaged In Off-bottom Oyster Aquaculture Operations; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Commission on Marine Resources; establish licensing and fees for vessels used in off-bottom oyster aquaculture.
Sponsors
Rep. Timmy Ladner [R] | Rep. Larry Byrd [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: PI To AC |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2019-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-12 | House | Passed |
2019-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-05 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To MR |
2019-02-04 | House | DR - TSDP: MR To WM |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Marine Resources;Ways and Means |