MS HB1266 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - Due From Governor 04/19/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - Due From Governor 04/19/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-75-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi Major Economic Impact Authority To Convey Property Acquired Under The Mississippi Major Economic Impact Act To Entities For Purposes In Furtherance Of Economic Development As Determined By The Authority; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Major Economic Impact Authority; revise authority to transfer property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | Due From Governor 04/19/12 | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-05 | Passed | |
2012-04-03 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-16 | Referred To Finance | |
2012-03-14 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-12 | Passed | |
2012-03-12 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Ways and Means |