MS HB1265 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That An Insured Individual Shall Be Entitled To Reimbursement For Certain Services Whenever His Or Her Policy Of Insurance, Medical Service Plan, Hospital Service Contract, Or Hospital And Medical Service Contract Issued In The State Of Mississippi Provides For Reimbursement For Any Service Which Is Within The Lawful Scope Of Practice Of A Duly Licensed Pharmacist; To Authorize Licensed Pharmacists To Participate In Such Policies, Plans, Or Contracts Providing For Pharmacy Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pharmacists; authorize reimbursement for under certain insurance policies, plans, or contracts.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Yancey [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Died On Calendar |
2024-04-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Michel,Sparks,Whaley |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Turner,Hobgood-Wilkes,Yancey |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2024-03-14 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Passed |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred To Insurance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
83 | 41 | 219 | New Code | See Bill Text |
83 | 9 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |