MS HB1264 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "mississippi Terroristic Threats Law"; To Define The Term "terroristic Threat"; To Provide That Making A Terroristic Threat Is A Felony Punishable By Imprisonment For Up To Ten Years; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Terroristic Threats Law; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Died In Conference |
2018-03-28 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2018-03-27 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Rpt Ruled Improper |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair |
2018-03-27 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Bryan,DeBar,Watson |
2018-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Cockerham,Aguirre |
2018-03-13 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2018-02-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed |
2018-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |