MS HB1261 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Authorizing A Title Insurance Company To Execute And Record Certain Records; Requiring Affidavit Contents; Providing That Certain Affidavits Will Operate As A Release For Certain Mortgages; Requiring County Clerk To Index Affidavit; Providing Penalties; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Title insurance company; authorize to record affidavit to release mortgage that is paid off.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 20 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions;Judiciary, Division A |
2016-02-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-02-25 | House | Passed |
2016-02-16 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |