MS HB1257 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-9-127, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Personnel Actions Of The Department Of Corrections, And The Commissioner Of The Department Of Corrections That Are Subject To The Rules And Regulations Of The State Personnel Board Shall Be Exempt From The State Personnel Board Rules, Regulations And Procedures Through July 1, 2022, And All Employees Of The Department Shall Be Classified As Nonstate Service During That Period In Order To Give The Commissioner Flexibility In Making An Orderly, Effective And Timely Realignment Of The Department; To Provide That Any Employee Hired After July 1, 2020, By The Department Shall Meet The Criteria Of The State Personnel Board As It Presently Exists For Employment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Corrections; exempt personnel actions from State Personnel Board for purpose of realignment.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Horan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/HB/HB1257.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1257IN.htm |