MS HB1256 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 7-7-213, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Fee To Be Charged By The State Auditor For Performing Audits And Other Services; To Amend Section 7-7-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Auditor; increase fee to be charged by for performing audits and other services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02SenateDied In Committee
2021-02-17SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2021-02-03HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-03HouseImmediate Release
2021-02-03HousePassed
2021-01-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77213Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback