MS HB1256 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-26-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Authority Of The Mississippi Development Authority To Issue Certificates Designating An Entity As An Approved Participant In The Tourism Project Sales Tax Incentive Program And Authorizing The Approved Participant To Participate In The Program; To Provide That Such Certificates Shall Not Be Issued After July 1, 2017; To Bring Forward Sections 57-26-3 And 57-26-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The Tourism Project Sales Tax Incentive Fund And Provide That The Mississippi Development Authority May Not Approve Applications For Certain Proposed Projects After June 30, 2104; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tourism project sales tax incentive program; extend authority of MDA to approve participants in.
Sponsors
Rep. Bobby Moak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Died In Committee |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Tourism;Ways and Means |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2014/pdf/history/HB/HB1256.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2014/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1256IN.htm |