MS HB1256 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 71-5-513, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That An Individual Who Is Not Hired For An Otherwise Suitable Position Due To A Positive Test For Illegal Substances, Including Drugs, Shall, For Purposes Of The Mississippi Employment Security Law, Be Deemed To Have Failed To Accept Suitable Work When Offered Him And As Such Subject To Disqualification From Receiving Employment Compensation Benefits; To Provide That A Disqualified Individual May Provide Information To End The Disqualification Period Early By Submitting Acceptable Proof To The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security Of A Negative Test Result From A Testing Facility Approved By The Department; To Provide That At Any Time During Or After The Assessed Disqualification Period, The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security May Require The Individual To Submit Acceptable Proof To The Department Of A Negative Test Result From A Testing Facility Approved By The Department In Order To Reinstate The Individual And Resume The Issuance Of Benefits Under Mississippi Employment Security Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Employment security law; require failure to be hired as a result of drug test is considered failure to accept suitable work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 93 N: 22 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-03-26 | Referred To Finance | |
2012-03-21 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-03-15 | Amended | |
2012-03-15 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Read the Third Time | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Judiciary A |