MS HB1245 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-10)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 65-1-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Mississippi Department Of Transportation To Maintain Grass Mowing Of Rights-of-way For Any State Highways Located Within The Municipal Limits Of Any Municipality In The State With A Population Of Ten Thousand (10,000) Or Less; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MDOT; require maintenance of rights-of-way of state highways inside municipal limits with 10,000 or less population.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-09 Approved by Governor
2021-04-01SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-04-01HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2021-03-27HouseConference Report Adopted
2021-03-26SenateConference Report Filed
2021-03-26HouseConference Report Filed
2021-03-24SenateConferees Named Simmons (12th),Barrett,McCaughn
2021-03-22HouseConferees Named Busby,Byrd,Faulkner
2021-03-17HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2021-03-10SenateReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-09SenatePassed As Amended
2021-03-09SenateAmended
2021-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-23SenateReferred To Municipalities
2021-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-04HousePassed As Amended
2021-02-04HouseAmended
2021-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
65175Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/history/HB/HB1245.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1245IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1245PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/HB/1200-1299/HB1245SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/ham/HB1245_H_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/sam/HB1245_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0310003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0640075.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0820005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0840029.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback