MS HB1243 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 97-25-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Impeding Critical Infrastructure As A Misdemeanor Or A Trespass, Depending On The Amount Of Resulting Damage Or Economic Loss, And To Define Critical Infrastructure Trespass As A Misdemeanor; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Critical infrastructure; define crimes of impeding and trespassing against.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] | Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. Brent Powell [R] | Rep. Fred Shanks [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 69 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 69 N: 47 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2020-03-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2020-03-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Bain, Sanford) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |