MS HB1240 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-3-82, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Any Certified And Accredited Law Enforcement Officers' Training Academy, Located Within The State Of Mississippi And Approved By The Board On Law Enforcement Officer Standards And Training, To Provide Training Through The Advanced Law Enforcement Rapid Response Training (alerrt) Program; To Bring Forward Section 37-7-321, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MCOPS programs; authorize training for to provide at any approved training academy in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Died In Conference |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named DeBar,Johnson,Boyd |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,McCarty,McKnight |
2022-03-16 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Education |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 3 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 7 | 321 | New Code | See Bill Text |