MS HB1240 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 31-7-103 And 31-7-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Minimum Acquisition Cost Of An Item Or Service Purchased By A County That Requires A Requisition, Purchase Order Or Receiving Report; To Authorize The City Of Charleston To Exercise Certain Powers Regardless Of Its Current Special Charter; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Counties; increase threshold amount that requires a requisition, purchase, purchase order or receiving report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred To County Affairs;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2017-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-09 | House | Amended |
2017-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2017-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-27 | House | DR - TSDP: AC To CA |
2017-01-24 | House | DR - TSDP: CA To AC |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To County Affairs;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |