MS HB1240 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 93-15-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Amend The Short Title Of The Chapter Regarding Termination Of Parental Rights; To Create New Section 93-15-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Enact Definitions; To Create New Section 93-15-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify Jurisdiction And Venue Under The Act; To Create New Section 93-15-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Commencement Of Proceedings, Necessary Parties And Summons; To Create New Section 93-15-109, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Surrender Of A Child; To Create New Section 93-15-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Termination By Written Voluntary Release; To Create New Section 93-15-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Procedures For The Involuntary Termination Of Parental Rights; To Create New Section 93-15-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Involuntary Termination Where A Reunification Attempt Is Mandatory; To Create New Section 93-15-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Involuntary Termination Where A Reunification Attempt Is Not Required; To Create New Section 93-15-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Involuntary Termination For Abandonment, Desertion Or Unfitness; To Create New Section 93-15-121, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify Grounds For Termination; To Create New Section 93-15-123, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Court To Decline To Terminate Parental Rights When In The Child's Best Interest; To Create New Section 93-15-125, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Compliance With The Federal Indian Child Welfare Act; To Create New Section 93-15-127, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide The Effect Of Termination On The Other Parent; To Create New Section 93-15-129, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify When A Termination Is A Preference Case; To Create New Section 93-15-131, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Post-judgment Proceedings; To Create New Section 93-15-133, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Appeals; To Amend Sections 93-17-5, 93-17-6 And 93-17-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Adoption Law To Conform To This Act; To Repeal Section 93-17-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Surrender Of A Child To An Organization Organized For The Purpose Of Caring For Or Adoption Of Children; To Repeal Sections 93-15-103, 93-15-105, 93-15-107, 93-15-109 And 93-15-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Comprise The Substantive Portion Of The Termination Of Rights Of Unfit Parents Law; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Termination of Parental Rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-05 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 39 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-18 Approved by Governor
2016-04-11SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-04-11HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-04-05HouseConcurred in Amend From Senate
2016-04-01SenateReturned For Concurrence
2016-03-30SenatePassed As Amended
2016-03-30SenateAmended
2016-03-17SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2016-02-29SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2016-02-26HouseTransmitted To Senate
2016-02-24HousePassed
2016-02-16HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2016-02-08HouseReferred To Judiciary A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback