MS HB1239 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 11-51-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Process For Appeals To The Circuit Court From A Judgment Or Decision Of The Board Of Supervisors Or The Governing Authority Of A Municipality; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Appeals to circuit court from county or municipal judgments; revise process regarding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,DeBar,Branning |
2018-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Smith,Lamar |
2018-03-07 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2018-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed |
2018-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |