MS HB1234 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 27-103-125, 27-103-139, 27-103-203, 27-103-211, 27-103-213, 27-103-303 And 65-37-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To Various Aspects Of The Budget Process, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Provide For Certain Transfers To The Capital Expense Fund During Fiscal Year 2018; To Repeal Section 22, Chapter 99, Laws Of 2017, Which Provides For The Funding Of A Certain Number Of Home- And Community-based Waiver Slots By The State Department Of Mental Health; To Amend Section 37, Chapter 102, Laws Of 2017, To Increase The Maximum Amount Of General Funds Appropriated To The State Department Of Education That Shall Be Used For The School Recognition Program; To Repeal Section 13, Chapter 64, Laws Of 2017, Which Authorizes The Commissioner Of The Department Of Corrections To Transfer Spending Authority Between And Within Budgets; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Budget process; bring forward various sections relating to.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Died In Conference |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Burton |
2018-03-19 | House | Conferees Named Read,Cockerham,Bounds |
2018-03-07 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-01-29 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-01-26 | House | Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | House | Referred To Appropriations |