MS HB1233 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Payment Of An Annual Salary Supplement And One Time Process Reimbursement To Athletic Trainers Who Have Acquired National Board Certification, And Who Are Licensed By The State And Employed By A Local School District; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School athletic trainers; provide annual salary supplement for those acquiring national certification.
Sponsors
Rep. Missy Warren McGee [R] | Rep. Kent McCarty [R] | Rep. Noah Sanford [R] | Rep. Donnie Scoggin [R] |
Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] | Rep. Otis Anthony [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-05 | House | Amended |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-03 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To ED |
2020-02-25 | House | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |